U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00046-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Fair
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: [Letters of Recommendation/Support regarding Sentencing]
January, 2025
  • January 01, 2025: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
December, 2024
  • December 18, 2024: [Presentence Investigation Report]
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Notice of Hearing Plea - Asheville]
  • October 04, 2024: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.