U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cr-00084-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Buruca et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 01, 2025: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • May 01, 2025: [Judgment]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 24, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 18, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 16, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 16, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • April 13, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • April 11, 2025: [Seal Document]
  • April 11, 2025: [Sealed Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
  • April 11, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
  • April 10, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
  • April 09, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
  • April 07, 2025: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 02, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 01, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 23, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 11, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report]
December, 2024
  • December 02, 2024: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 01, 2024: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
November, 2024
  • November 17, 2024: [Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
October, 2024
  • October 04, 2024: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.