U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cr-00009-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Kennedy
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Unredacted Document]
  • April 25, 2025: [Service by Publication]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 09, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • March 21, 2025: [Judgment]
  • March 20, 2025: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • March 20, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • March 17, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 12, 2025: [Factual Basis]
  • March 11, 2025: [Letters of Recommendation/Support regarding Sentencing]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 08, 2024: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 04, 2024: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.