U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:23-cr-00048-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lindberg
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • April 17, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • March 18, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 04, 2024: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • October 04, 2024: [Seal Document]
  • October 04, 2024: [Sealed Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.