U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cr-00035-3
  • Case Name: USA v. Suber et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 08, 2025: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • May 07, 2025: [Sealed Motion]
  • May 05, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • April 22, 2025: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • April 21, 2025: [Factual Basis]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • April 14, 2025: [Seal Document]
February, 2025
  • February 24, 2025: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
October, 2024
  • October 04, 2024: [Presentence Investigation Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.