U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cr-00171-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Allison et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • April 17, 2025: [Seal Document]
  • April 17, 2025: [Sealed Document]
  • April 17, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • April 14, 2025: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 25, 2025: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 17, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report]
February, 2025
  • February 27, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report]
October, 2024
  • October 04, 2024: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • October 04, 2024: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.