U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cr-00183-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Welch et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 09, 2025: [Reset Docket Call and Excludable]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • April 08, 2025: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 19, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • March 13, 2025: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 11, 2025: [Modify Conditions of Release]
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • October 09, 2024: [Notice Regarding Passport]
  • October 08, 2024: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • October 08, 2024: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 08, 2024: [Bond]
  • October 08, 2024: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • October 08, 2024: [Order of Detention]
  • October 08, 2024: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 08, 2024: [Arraignment and Detention]
  • October 08, 2024: [Pretrial Report]
  • October 07, 2024: [Pretrial Report]
  • October 04, 2024: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.