U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:23-cr-00083-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Roseboro, Jr
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • April 22, 2025: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • April 17, 2025: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • April 17, 2025: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 17, 2025: [Inquiry into Status of Counsel]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
January, 2025
  • January 10, 2025: [Bond Hearing]
October, 2024
  • October 04, 2024: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • October 03, 2024: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.