U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cr-00110-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Moses et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Service by Publication]
  • March 30, 2025: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 14, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report]
February, 2025
  • February 22, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2024
  • October 04, 2024: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • October 03, 2024: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.