U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cr-00076-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Tomar
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 10, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • April 10, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Sealed Motion]
  • October 11, 2024: [Sealed Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
  • October 09, 2024: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 08, 2024: [Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
  • October 07, 2024: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 07, 2024: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • October 04, 2024: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 04, 2024: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • October 03, 2024: [Sealed Motion]
  • October 03, 2024: [Sealed Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.