U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cr-00191-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Farmer
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 10, 2025: [Judgment ]
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: [Sentencing ]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • March 14, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Motion Submitted]
  • October 09, 2024: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • October 07, 2024: [Notice-other]
  • October 04, 2024: [Extension of Time]
  • October 04, 2024: [Continue ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.