U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cr-00073-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Edwards
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 30, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 21, 2025: [Motion Submitted]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice of Deficiency]
  • April 19, 2025: [Stay]
  • April 19, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 18, 2025: [Seal Document]
  • April 18, 2025: [PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit]
  • April 18, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 18, 2025: [Dismiss ]
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 09, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 01, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Response in Opposition]
  • October 04, 2024: [Suppress ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.