U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00095-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BELSER et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Assembled Electronic Record Transmitted to Fourth Circuit]
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Motion Submitted]
  • October 08, 2024: [Transmission of Update Item to USCA]
  • October 08, 2024: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • October 08, 2024: [Judgment]
  • October 07, 2024: [Electronic Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • October 05, 2024: [Exhibit]
  • October 05, 2024: [Notice of Appeal Without Fee Payment]
  • October 05, 2024: [Miscellaneous Relief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.