U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00084-1
  • Case Name: USA v. CURRIE
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Electronic Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Notice of Appeal Without Fee Payment]
  • April 22, 2025: [Sentencing]
March, 2025
  • March 11, 2025: [SEALED USPO Resentencing Memorandum]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Response to Motion]
  • October 11, 2024: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • October 10, 2024: [Order]
  • October 10, 2024: [USCA Notice of Docketing Record on Appeal]
  • October 09, 2024: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 09, 2024: [Order]
  • October 08, 2024: [Transmission of Update Item to USCA]
  • October 08, 2024: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • October 08, 2024: [Judgment]
  • October 07, 2024: [Motion Submitted]
  • October 07, 2024: [SEALED Motion]
  • October 07, 2024: [Electronic Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • October 05, 2024: [Notice of Appeal Without Fee Payment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.