U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00158-1
  • Case Name: USA v. CLEMONS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 17, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • April 15, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 15, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • April 04, 2025: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Motion Submitted]
  • March 26, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 24, 2025: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • March 20, 2025: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 09, 2024: [Defendant Assigned/Reassigned]
  • October 05, 2024: [Factual Basis Document]
  • October 05, 2024: [Plea Agreement]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.