U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cr-00042-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Thompson et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • April 23, 2025: [SEALED Appeal Transcript ]
  • April 23, 2025: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • April 02, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: [USCA Order]
January, 2025
  • January 27, 2025: [USCA Case Number ]
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: [Objection to PSI]
  • October 07, 2024: [Objection to PSI]
  • October 05, 2024: [Notice of Hearing ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.