U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cr-00235-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rodriguez-Flores
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • April 22, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 02, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Notice to Counsel]
  • October 05, 2024: [Notice of Hearing ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.