U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:23-cr-00192-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Welton
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 09, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • April 09, 2025: [Plea Agreement ]
  • April 09, 2025: [Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 09, 2025: [Arraignment ]
  • April 09, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 09, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 07, 2025: [Text Order]
  • April 07, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 01, 2025: [Motion Submitted]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum (NOT SEALED)]
  • March 31, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 28, 2025: [Plea Agreement Supplement]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Notice to Counsel]
  • October 05, 2024: [Notice of Hearing ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.