U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cr-00187-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gilmore
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Notification to Appeals Court of Filing]
  • May 07, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • May 06, 2025: [Motion Submitted]
  • May 05, 2025: [Withdraw Document]
  • May 02, 2025: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • May 02, 2025: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Sealed Motion to Show Cause re Revocation of Supervised Release]
  • April 23, 2025: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • April 22, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2024
  • October 05, 2024: [Notice of Hearing ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.