U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cr-00094-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Puddy
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Amended Penalty Sheet]
  • April 22, 2025: [Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 22, 2025: [Plea Agreement ]
  • April 22, 2025: [Arraignment ]
  • April 22, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 22, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
March, 2025
  • March 13, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 11, 2025: [Motion Submitted]
  • March 11, 2025: [Continue ]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Notice to Counsel]
  • October 05, 2024: [Notice of Hearing ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.