U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cr-00151-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gilmore
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • May 12, 2025: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • May 06, 2025: [Judgment ]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Sentencing ]
  • April 22, 2025: [Amended Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 22, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 21, 2025: [Objection to PSI]
  • April 17, 2025: [Seal Document]
  • April 17, 2025: [PROPOSED SEALED Document]
  • April 16, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Objection to PSI]
  • March 17, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Notice to Counsel]
  • October 05, 2024: [Notice of Hearing ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.