U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:23-cr-00165-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Dartey, et al.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [USCA Order]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Remark]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice-other]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Motion for Return of Property/PostTrial]
January, 2025
  • January 14, 2025: [Motion Submitted]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Notice to Counsel]
  • October 09, 2024: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • October 09, 2024: [Transcript]
  • October 05, 2024: [Notice of Hearing ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.