U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:23-cr-00201-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Ortega
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Notice of Hearing ]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Sentencing ]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on SEALED Motion]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • April 11, 2025: [Seal ]
  • April 11, 2025: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice of Hearing ]
March, 2025
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on SEALED Motion]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • March 17, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 17, 2025: [Motion Submitted]
  • March 13, 2025: [Motion Submitted]
  • March 12, 2025: [Continue Sentencing]
  • March 12, 2025: [Seal ]
  • March 12, 2025: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • October 10, 2024: [Arraignment ]
  • October 10, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 10, 2024: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 07, 2024: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 07, 2024: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.