U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cr-00064-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Morrison
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 12, 2025: [Motion Submitted]
  • May 09, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 01, 2025: [Scheduling Order ]
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 17, 2025: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 15, 2025: [Arraignment ]
  • April 15, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 07, 2025: [Release Status Report]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss ]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion to Suppress ]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Hearing ]
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 07, 2024: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.