U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:24-cr-00040-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Mondragon et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 07, 2025: [Plea Agreement ]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Arraignment ]
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss ]
  • April 17, 2025: [Motion Submitted]
  • April 17, 2025: [Dismiss ]
  • April 10, 2025: [Judgment ]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 09, 2025: [Motion Referred]
  • April 08, 2025: [Continue ]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • March 20, 2025: [Sentencing ]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • March 17, 2025: [Restricted Sentencing Statement]
January, 2025
  • January 25, 2025: [Objection to PSI]
  • January 22, 2025: [Objection to PSI]
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • October 07, 2024: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 07, 2024: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.