U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:23-cr-00277-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Veal
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: [Judgment ]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 09, 2025: [Sentencing ]
  • April 09, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 02, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum (NOT SEALED)]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • March 18, 2025: [Objection to PSI]
  • March 17, 2025: [Objection to PSI]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Hearing ]
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • October 07, 2024: [Arraignment ]
  • October 07, 2024: [~Util - Plea Entered]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.