U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cr-00155-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cardona-Ramirez et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Notice of Hearing ]
April, 2025
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 07, 2025: [Continue ]
  • April 03, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 03, 2025: [Request for Discovery]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • March 28, 2025: [Motion Submitted]
  • March 28, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • March 20, 2025: [Scheduling Order ]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Hearing ]
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • October 07, 2024: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 07, 2024: [Motion Referred]
  • October 07, 2024: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.