U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cr-00296-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Perry et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 30, 2025: [Continue ]
  • April 03, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice to Counsel]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • March 26, 2025: [Motion Submitted]
  • March 25, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice of Hearing ]
October, 2024
  • October 14, 2024: [Continue ]
  • October 11, 2024: [Initial Appearance ]
  • October 11, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 11, 2024: [Text Order]
  • October 11, 2024: [Oral Order]
  • October 11, 2024: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • October 11, 2024: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 11, 2024: [Detention]
  • October 11, 2024: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • October 11, 2024: [Arrest ]
  • October 11, 2024: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • October 10, 2024: [Request for Discovery]
  • October 10, 2024: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 10, 2024: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • October 10, 2024: [Detention]
  • October 10, 2024: [Order]
  • October 10, 2024: [Oral Order]
  • October 10, 2024: [Initial Appearance ]
  • October 10, 2024: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 08, 2024: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 07, 2024: [Penalty Sheet]
  • October 07, 2024: [Warrant Requested]
  • October 07, 2024: [Warrant Issued ]
  • October 07, 2024: [Indictment ]
  • October 07, 2024: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.