U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:24-cr-00032-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Godfrey
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [USCA Case Number ]
  • May 02, 2025: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • May 02, 2025: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Judgment ]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • April 16, 2025: [Sentencing ]
  • April 15, 2025: [Seal ]
  • April 15, 2025: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • April 07, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 02, 2025: [Restricted Sentencing Statement]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Hearing ]
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 07, 2024: [Order on PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • October 07, 2024: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • October 07, 2024: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • October 07, 2024: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 07, 2024: [Motion Submitted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.