U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cr-00238-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Houston et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Sentencing ]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • April 02, 2025: [Plea Agreement ]
  • April 02, 2025: [Plea Agreement Supplement]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • March 27, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • March 24, 2025: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • March 24, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 24, 2025: [Arraignment ]
  • March 24, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • March 21, 2025: [Objection to PSI]
  • March 18, 2025: [Objection to PSI]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 13, 2025: [Objection to PSI]
  • March 13, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • March 13, 2025: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 13, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice of Hearing ]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Amended Penalty Sheet]
  • October 10, 2024: [Notice of Waiver of Initial Appearance on Superseding Indictment]
  • October 10, 2024: [Motion Submitted]
  • October 08, 2024: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • October 07, 2024: [Unredacted Document]
  • October 07, 2024: [Penalty Sheet]
  • October 07, 2024: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.