U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cr-00293-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Metcalf
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Order of Competency to Stand Trial ]
  • April 02, 2025: [Motion Submitted]
  • April 01, 2025: [Determine Competency to Stand Trial]
March, 2025
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 12, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • March 12, 2025: [Continue ]
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [1Fox Case Reassigned]
  • October 07, 2024: [Penalty Sheet]
  • October 07, 2024: [Unredacted Document]
  • October 07, 2024: [Warrant Requested]
  • October 07, 2024: [Warrant Issued ]
  • October 07, 2024: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.