U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00232-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SPENCER
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 15, 2025: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • March 18, 2025: [SEALED Order]
  • March 17, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • March 17, 2025: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • March 14, 2025: [Ex Parte Motion]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • March 13, 2025: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • March 12, 2025: [Motion Submitted]
  • March 11, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • March 10, 2025: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • March 10, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Consent to Collection]
  • October 07, 2024: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 07, 2024: [Defendant Assigned/Reassigned]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.