U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cr-00222-1
  • Case Name: USA v. LONG
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • May 01, 2025: [Sentencing]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • April 29, 2025: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • April 11, 2025: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice of Rescheduling]
  • March 21, 2025: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
October, 2024
  • October 31, 2024: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • October 16, 2024: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • October 10, 2024: [Motion Submitted]
  • October 09, 2024: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 07, 2024: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.