U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cr-00370-1
  • Case Name: USA v. CARROL
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 06, 2025: [Motion Submitted]
  • May 05, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • May 05, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 02, 2025: [Declaration]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • April 24, 2025: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 19, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice of Cancellation]
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Consent to Collection]
  • October 07, 2024: [Defendant Assigned/Reassigned]
  • October 07, 2024: [Change of Plea Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.