U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cr-00163-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Bridges et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 07, 2025: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • April 07, 2025: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • April 07, 2025: [Plea Hearing]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 26, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 26, 2025: [Factual Basis]
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • October 07, 2024: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 07, 2024: [Order]
  • October 07, 2024: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • October 07, 2024: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 07, 2024: [Inquiry into Status of Counsel]
  • October 07, 2024: [Arraignment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.