U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cr-00142-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lacy
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 13, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 07, 2025: [Response to Motion]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time re: Other]
  • April 22, 2025: [Extension of Time re: Other]
  • April 16, 2025: [Suppress]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • March 24, 2025: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • October 07, 2024: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.