U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cr-00186-4
  • Case Name: USA v. Hernandez-Sanchez et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 13, 2025: [Factual Basis]
  • May 08, 2025: [Plea Hearing Held - Not Completed]
  • May 08, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • April 23, 2025: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • April 23, 2025: [Plea Hearing]
  • April 23, 2025: [Factual Basis]
  • April 23, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 22, 2025: [Factual Basis]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • April 11, 2025: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
October, 2024
  • October 19, 2024: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • October 10, 2024: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • October 10, 2024: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 10, 2024: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • October 10, 2024: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 10, 2024: [Pretrial Report]
  • October 09, 2024: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 09, 2024: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 08, 2024: [Rule 5 Documents Received]
  • October 08, 2024: [Arrest - Other District]
  • October 08, 2024: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 07, 2024: [Rule 5 Documents Received]
  • October 07, 2024: [Arrest - Other District]
  • October 07, 2024: [Warrant Returned Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.