U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cr-00132-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Quijada-Ortega
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • May 02, 2025: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • April 01, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
March, 2025
  • March 11, 2025: [Reply to Response]
  • March 04, 2025: [Response in Opposition]
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • October 07, 2024: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.