U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cr-00187-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lloyd
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 24, 2025: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 11, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report]
October, 2024
  • October 16, 2024: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • October 11, 2024: [Letters of Recommendation/Support regarding Sentencing]
  • October 07, 2024: [Order on Motion to Continue Other]
  • October 07, 2024: [Continue Other]
  • October 07, 2024: [Arraignment and Detention]
  • October 07, 2024: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 07, 2024: [Pretrial Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.