U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cr-00177-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Savage
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • May 02, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 18, 2025: [Service by Publication]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 14, 2025: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • March 14, 2025: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • March 14, 2025: [Plea Hearing]
  • March 13, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 13, 2025: [Factual Basis]
  • March 11, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • October 08, 2024: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 08, 2024: [Pretrial Report]
  • October 07, 2024: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 07, 2024: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • October 07, 2024: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • October 07, 2024: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 07, 2024: [Order of Detention]
  • October 07, 2024: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 07, 2024: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 07, 2024: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • October 07, 2024: [Initial Appearance and Arraignment]
  • October 07, 2024: [Arrest]
  • October 07, 2024: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.