U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cr-00014-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gregory
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Order]
  • May 09, 2025: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • May 09, 2025: [Oral Order]
  • May 09, 2025: [Docket Call]
  • May 09, 2025: [Arraignment ]
  • May 09, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice-other]
  • April 09, 2025: [Unredacted Document]
  • April 09, 2025: [Penalty Sheet]
  • April 09, 2025: [Indictment ]
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 08, 2024: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 08, 2024: [Motion Submitted]
  • October 07, 2024: [Continue ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.