U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cr-00264-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Howard, et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 05, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • May 05, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 05, 2025: [Continue ]
  • May 02, 2025: [Continue ]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • April 24, 2025: [Continue ]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 23, 2025: [Continue ]
  • April 23, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • April 23, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 15, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • April 15, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 15, 2025: [Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 15, 2025: [Plea Agreement ]
  • April 15, 2025: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • April 15, 2025: [Arraignment ]
  • April 15, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • April 14, 2025: [Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 14, 2025: [Plea Agreement ]
  • April 14, 2025: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • April 14, 2025: [Arraignment ]
  • April 14, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 03, 2025: [Continue ]
  • April 01, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 01, 2025: [Continue ]
March, 2025
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Hearing ]
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 09, 2024: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • October 09, 2024: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 09, 2024: [Extension of Time]
  • October 09, 2024: [Continue ]
  • October 07, 2024: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 07, 2024: [Text Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.