U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cr-00359-1
  • Case Name: USA v. LILLY
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [USCA Notice of Docketing Record on Appeal]
  • April 23, 2025: [Electronic Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Appeal Without Fee Payment]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 10, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 08, 2025: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • April 08, 2025: [Judgment]
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • March 13, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 11, 2024: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 11, 2024: [Motion Submitted]
  • October 10, 2024: [Continue ]
  • October 07, 2024: [Motion Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.