U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cr-00086-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Smith
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 13, 2025: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 24, 2025: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • March 18, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • October 07, 2024: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.