U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:23-cr-00068-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Thomason
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • April 08, 2025: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Miscellaneous Filing]
December, 2024
  • December 23, 2024: [Modify Conditions of Release]
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • October 07, 2024: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.