U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cr-00237-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Howard
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • May 07, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • May 07, 2025: [Dismiss ]
  • May 07, 2025: [Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 07, 2025: [Plea Agreement ]
  • May 07, 2025: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • May 07, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing ]
  • May 07, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • May 02, 2025: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Hearing ]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Motion Referred]
  • April 25, 2025: [Motion Submitted]
  • April 25, 2025: [Hearing ]
March, 2025
  • March 11, 2025: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 08, 2024: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 07, 2024: [Continue ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.