U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:23-cr-00252-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bryant
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: [Judgment ]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 11, 2025: [Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 11, 2025: [Plea Agreement Accepted ]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on SEALED Motion]
  • April 11, 2025: [Sentencing ]
March, 2025
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Hearing ]
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 08, 2024: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 07, 2024: [Motion Submitted]
  • October 07, 2024: [Continue ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.