U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cr-00256-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Chavirs
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • May 08, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • May 08, 2025: [Continue Sentencing]
  • May 05, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
March, 2025
  • March 12, 2025: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • March 12, 2025: [Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 12, 2025: [Plea Agreement ]
  • March 12, 2025: [Arraignment ]
  • March 12, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 12, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 08, 2024: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • October 08, 2024: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 07, 2024: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • October 07, 2024: [Continue ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.