U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cr-00209-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BULLOCK
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Judgment on Revocation of Prob/SR]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - Sentencing]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • October 10, 2024: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 10, 2024: [Notice of Related Case]
  • October 10, 2024: [Warrant Issued-SEALED SRV]
  • October 10, 2024: [SEALED Order for Warrant]
  • October 09, 2024: [Case Referred to Judge]
  • October 08, 2024: [SEALED USPO PROB 12C - Supplement Report]
  • October 08, 2024: [SEALED USPO PROB 12C - Offender Under Supervision]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.