U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00200-2
  • Case Name: USA v. HERBIN et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Notice of Appeal]
  • May 13, 2025: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • May 13, 2025: [Judgment]
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • April 15, 2025: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • April 15, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 14, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • April 10, 2025: [SEALED Document]
  • April 09, 2025: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • April 02, 2025: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 27, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • March 26, 2025: [Motion Submitted]
  • March 26, 2025: [Defendant Assigned/Reassigned]
  • March 25, 2025: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • March 25, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 24, 2025: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • March 18, 2025: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • March 12, 2025: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 10, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 08, 2024: [Defendant Assigned/Reassigned]
  • October 08, 2024: [Change of Plea Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.